This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/05/2022 at 21:00:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS MAINE, KEITH TOMAS

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MAINE, KEITH TOMAS. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KRUG, THOMAS and PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KRUG, THOMAS

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MAINE, KEITH TOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIDEN, THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-55080

7/1/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-55080

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/1/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/1/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/1/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/1/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/1/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/6/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

BOND - PAPER PSE5989462

7/14/2022: BOND - PAPER PSE5989462

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 7/22/2022)

7/21/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 7/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING; Court Result: CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingTime: 08:45 AM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING; Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 7/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER PSE5989462

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Jul 22 2022 8:45AM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Jul 22 2022 9:00AM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: 4A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Jul 22 2022 9:00AM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-55080

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL