This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2022 at 21:03:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS MAILHOT, KEVEN JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MAILHOT, KEVEN JOSEPH. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MAILHOT, KEVEN JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNN, STEPHEN

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

PASQUALI, JAMIE

 

Court Documents

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

1/14/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

1/14/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

1/14/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/14/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO # 22-3789

1/14/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO # 22-3789

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

1/14/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

1/18/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

SUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

1/18/2022: SUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

1/18/2022: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

1/19/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT

1/21/2022: ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/1/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

2/14/2022: MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 02/16/2022)

2/15/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 02/16/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingTime:02:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING DATE: Feb 28 2022 2:30PM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING DATE: Feb 28 2022 2:30PM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketACTION: COPIES OF THE ORDER TO APPOINT EXPERT SENT TO SAO, PD, SSO AND EXPERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING EXPERT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Feb 17 2022 11:00AM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO # 22-3789

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASQUALI, JAMIE