This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 21:03:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS LOWE, JACOB TYLER

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LOWE, JACOB TYLER. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LOWE, JACOB TYLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGINN, MEGAN

Defendant Attorneys

RIBEL, ZACHARY

GETTY, AARON

ACE, MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. A53K - 498438

5/12/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. A53K - 498438

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

5/11/2022: STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

5/9/2022: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

5/9/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

INFORMATION - PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/22

4/28/2022: INFORMATION - PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT; WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

4/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT; WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

4/26/2022: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

4/26/2022: ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AMENDED

4/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AMENDED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/19/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/18/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/18/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION 22-32730

4/18/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION 22-32730

IMPLIED CONSENT WARNING

4/18/2022: IMPLIED CONSENT WARNING

VEHICLE TOW AND STORAGE RECEIPT

4/18/2022: VEHICLE TOW AND STORAGE RECEIPT

COPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

4/18/2022: COPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

WITNESS STATEMENT

4/18/2022: WITNESS STATEMENT

AFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

4/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM A; Description:CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. A53K - 498438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 06/21/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN A , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AFA8BHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION - PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT; WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION AFA8BHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION AFA8BHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-32730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 05/09/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN A , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACE, MICHELLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZACHARY MARK RIBEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GETTY, AARON