This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 11/19/2021 at 21:00:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS LEWIS, ASHLEY CINTHIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEWIS, ASHLEY CINTHIA. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

SWORE, ASHLEY CINTHIA

LEWIS, ASHLEY CINTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLOAN, MARLO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 4A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 11/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER #2021-AA-069595

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD #21-59222

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 12/03/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A , JDG: KRUG, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLOAN, MARLO