This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/29/2022 at 21:01:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS LEONARD, DOREEN MACKAY

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEONARD, DOREEN MACKAY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LEONARD, DOREEN MACKAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMCHAK, CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

STODDARD, BARTHOLOMEW

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/24/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-48719

6/24/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-48719

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/24/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - 22-48720

6/24/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - 22-48720

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/24/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

CASH 9076516A POSTED $1,500.00

6/27/2022: CASH 9076516A POSTED $1,500.00

CASH 9076516A POSTED $120.00

6/27/2022: CASH 9076516A POSTED $120.00

BOND - CASH #9076516A

6/27/2022: BOND - CASH #9076516A

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 7/29/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - CASH #9076516A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH 9076516A POSTED $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH 9076516A POSTED $1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCASH BOND PAYMENT RECEIPT: 2022057106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - 22-48720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-48719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STODDARD, BARTHOLOMEW