This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/24/2022 at 21:04:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS KIRBY, THADDEUS EUGENE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KIRBY, THADDEUS EUGENE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KIRBY, THADDEUS EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMCHAK, CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL

COEN, PETER

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/20/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

CITATION - AG6VANE

7/20/2022: CITATION - AG6VANE

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-61183

7/20/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-61183

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/20/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/21/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/21/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/21/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/26/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

7/28/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

7/29/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/4/22)

8/3/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/4/22)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/5/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AG6VANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/4/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AG6VANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-61183

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AG6VANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COEN, PETER