This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/25/2022 at 21:02:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS KIPPIN, MURISA NICOLE

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KIPPIN, MURISA NICOLE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KIPPIN, MURISA NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMCHAK, CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/21/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

7/21/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/21/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/21/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/21/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/21/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/24/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

7/27/2022: INFORMATION

SCORESHEET

7/28/2022: SCORESHEET

APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITHOUT A BOND

7/28/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITHOUT A BOND

ORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

8/4/2022: ORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022130421)

8/5/2022: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022130421)

SENTENCE / SPECIAL PROVISIONS FORM

8/5/2022: SENTENCE / SPECIAL PROVISIONS FORM

ORDER - ADJUDICATION GUILTY PLACING ON PROBATION

8/5/2022: ORDER - ADJUDICATION GUILTY PLACING ON PROBATION

WARRANT VIOLATION OF PROBATION

8/15/2022: WARRANT VIOLATION OF PROBATION

AFFIDAVIT VIOLATION OF PROBATION

8/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT VIOLATION OF PROBATION

VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

8/15/2022: VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY; Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022004347 - VIOLATION OF PROBATION - CURRENT STATUS: ACCEPTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022004347 - VIOLATION OF PROBATION - ISSUED: VIOLATION OF PROBATION/COMMUNITY CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT VIOLATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT VIOLATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADJUDICATION GUILTY PLACING ON PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSENTENCE / SPECIAL PROVISIONS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022130421)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CRIMES COMPENSATION TRUST FUND-FELONY/JUVENILE (F.S. 938.03); Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT-COUNTY (F.S. 938.15 and CTY ORD 81-127); Total Fee: $2.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: DRUG ABUSE MISDMEANOR COURT COST (F.S. 938.13 and CTY ORD 2008-036); Total Fee: $15.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CRIMINAL JUSTICE TRUST FUND-FELONY (F.S. 938.05); Total Fee: $225.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL