This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/14/2020 at 18:02:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS KASDORF, JOHN WAYNE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KASDORF, JOHN WAYNE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KASDORF, JOHN WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGLER, KENNEDY

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

BAISHANSKI, ALEXANDRA

MCINTOSH, BRETT DONALD

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 2/7/2020)

2/6/2020: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 2/7/2020)

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/6/2020: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

1/27/2020: ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

1/27/2020: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

1/24/2020: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

1/23/2020: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

1/21/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

1/21/2020: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

1/21/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

1/21/2020: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/21/2020: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

1/21/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

BOND - PAPER - POWER #555226612-3

1/21/2020: BOND - PAPER - POWER #555226612-3

BOND - PAPER - POWER #555226611-0

1/21/2020: BOND - PAPER - POWER #555226611-0

DECISION TO DECLINE TO APPLY FOR THE SERVICES OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/21/2020: DECISION TO DECLINE TO APPLY FOR THE SERVICES OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

1/21/2020: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 2/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketACTION:COPIES SENT TO SAO, PD AND PACKET SENT TO B MCINTOSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER #555226612-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER #555226611-0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION TO DECLINE TO APPLY FOR THE SERVICES OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less