This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/16/2022 at 21:01:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS KANE, TONYA JEAN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KANE, TONYA JEAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

KANE, TONYA JEAN

KANE, TONYA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMCHAK, CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

PASQUALI, JAMIE

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/12/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-66008

8/12/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-66008

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/12/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

WITNESS STATEMENT

8/12/2022: WITNESS STATEMENT

BOND - PAPER - POWER# PSE51005967

8/12/2022: BOND - PAPER - POWER# PSE51005967

BOND - PAPER - POWER# PSE51005966

8/12/2022: BOND - PAPER - POWER# PSE51005966

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

8/19/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/19/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/30/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

8/31/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF RECOMMIT/SURRENDER

9/2/2022: NOTICE OF RECOMMIT/SURRENDER

NOTICE OF RECOMMIT/SURRENDER

9/2/2022: NOTICE OF RECOMMIT/SURRENDER

MOTION - RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

9/13/2022: MOTION - RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

9/13/2022: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 9/14/22)

9/13/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 9/14/22)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 9/14/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECOMMIT/SURRENDER POWER# PSE51005967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECOMMIT/SURRENDER POWER# PSE51005966

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER# PSE51005966

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER# PSE51005967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-66008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASQUALI, JAMIE