This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 21:06:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS JONES, AJA MARIAH

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONES, AJA MARIAH. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JONES, AJA MARIAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTPHAL, STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

HARRISON, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

7/19/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

INFORMATION

7/19/2022: INFORMATION

WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE

7/18/2022: WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE

CORRESPONDENCE AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

7/12/2022: CORRESPONDENCE AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

7/12/2022: ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

BOND - CASH NO. 9076562A

7/11/2022: BOND - CASH NO. 9076562A

CASH 9076562A POSTED $120.00

7/11/2022: CASH 9076562A POSTED $120.00

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

7/8/2022: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

7/8/2022: PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/1/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

7/1/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

COPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

7/1/2022: COPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

WITNESS STATEMENT

7/1/2022: WITNESS STATEMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

7/1/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

AFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

7/1/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

AFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

7/1/2022: AFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

IMPLIED CONSENT WARNING

7/1/2022: IMPLIED CONSENT WARNING

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/1/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Description: CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AFA8ETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 08/09/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - CASH NO. 9076562A

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIMPLIED CONSENT WARNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AFA8ETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AFA8ETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRISON, ROBERT