This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:00:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS JOHNSON, WILLIAM J

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNSON, WILLIAM J. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOHNSON, WILLIAM J

 

Court Documents

SUBPOENA SERVED

10/16/2020: SUBPOENA SERVED

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

10/1/2020: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

BOND - PAPER - POWER # 006-10627229

9/25/2020: BOND - PAPER - POWER # 006-10627229

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

9/25/2020: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

CITATION # AA5MN4E

9/25/2020: CITATION # AA5MN4E

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT # 19-62127

9/25/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT # 19-62127

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9/25/2020: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$50.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AA5MN4E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER # 006-10627229

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION # AA5MN4E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT # 19-62127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less