This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:01:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS HUNEYCUTT, CARLEY ANN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HUNEYCUTT, CARLEY ANN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HUNEYCUTT, CARLEY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS, TAMARA

 

Court Documents

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

9/30/2020: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

9/30/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

BOND - PAPER POWER AS15K313082

9/29/2020: BOND - PAPER POWER AS15K313082

BOND - PAPER POWER AS15K313080

9/29/2020: BOND - PAPER POWER AS15K313080

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

9/28/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

9/25/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

9/25/2020: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

9/25/2020: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #20-64609

9/25/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #20-64609

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9/25/2020: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER AS15K313082

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER AS15K313080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2020CF010968NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2020CF010968NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #20-64609

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less