Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 09:44:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS HOUSER, GINGER Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HOUSER, GINGER. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTS, CHARLES E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

TILLMAN, GINGER L

TILLMAN, GINGER LEE

HOUSER, GINGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSICKLE, ANDREW

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

MARCHESE, ROSEMARIE

DISKEY, DANIEL DWIGHT

BOOTH, RICHARD CURTIS

PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON

SPEYER, ERIN

SNELLING, JEFFREY PAUL

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION

11/7/2018: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION

ADMISSION TO VIOLATION OF PROBATION & WAIVER OF RIGHTS

10/25/2018: ADMISSION TO VIOLATION OF PROBATION & WAIVER OF RIGHTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ACKNOWLEDGMENT WAIVER OF RIGHTS

4/13/2018: ACKNOWLEDGMENT WAIVER OF RIGHTS

EMAIL CONVERSATION DOCUMENT - RECALL WARRANT

11/17/2017: EMAIL CONVERSATION DOCUMENT - RECALL WARRANT

ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE BOND

8/29/2017: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE BOND

NOTICE OF HEARING TO REINSTATE BOND

8/28/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING TO REINSTATE BOND

ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

8/7/2017: ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

RECEIPT, REVIEW AND ACTION TAKEN REGARDING CORESPON

5/23/2017: RECEIPT, REVIEW AND ACTION TAKEN REGARDING CORESPON

JUDGMENT - COST - PAY PLAN - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020031851)

3/5/2020: JUDGMENT - COST - PAY PLAN - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020031851)

JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018144157)

11/1/2018: JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018144157)

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9/24/2018: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

7/3/2018: VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

APPEARANCE RECORD

10/3/2017: APPEARANCE RECORD

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

8/30/2017: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

8/7/2017: ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

PD MOTION TO WITHDRAW

4/27/2017: PD MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER -SETTING BOND

3/27/2017: ORDER -SETTING BOND

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCASE SENT TO COLLECTIONS AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCASE SENT TO COLLECTIONS AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - COST - PAY PLAN - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020031851)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - COST - PAY PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAY PLAN NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • HearingTime:08:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3B; Description:CRIMINAL - PLEA ;Court Result:Cancelled Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSENTENCE / SPECIAL PROVISIONS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECOMMIT/SURRENDER POWER # AC17073050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER # AC17-073050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$668.00; Amount Paid:$200.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$468.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT #17-6034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANSICKLE, ANDREW