This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/30/2022 at 00:17:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GUTIERREZ, ANDREW

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GUTIERREZ, ANDREW. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GUTIERREZ, ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LUX, SEAN

SIDDALL, ROBERT

RUHL, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

3/24/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

3/24/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

3/24/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

3/24/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

3/24/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739384

3/25/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739384

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739383

3/25/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739383

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739385

3/25/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739385

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739387

3/25/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739387

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739388

3/25/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739388

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739386

3/25/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739386

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

4/14/2022: DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

4/14/2022: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE

4/14/2022: WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE

APPEARANCE RECORD

4/29/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739386

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739387

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739383

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AA22-739384

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUX, SEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUHL, RICHARD