This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/16/2022 at 21:02:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GUDMESTAD, LAWRENCE JOHN

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GUDMESTAD, LAWRENCE JOHN. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GUDMESTAD, LAWRENCE JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

PASQUALI, JAMIE

 

Court Documents

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS6K838499

5/12/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS6K838499

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/13/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-40132

5/13/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-40132

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

5/13/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/31/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/15/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/16/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSURETY AS6K838499 (812.014(3C)) REVOKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-40132

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS6K838499

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant