This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/23/2022 at 21:01:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GREEN, TONY

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GREEN, TONY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GREEN, TONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIDEN, THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

ADAMS, MARK

MEISNER, JEROME

CUMMER, ANDREW WEST

 

Court Documents

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/18/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/18/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

4/18/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/18/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/18/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SPD-22-020897

4/18/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SPD-22-020897

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/19/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

4/27/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

4/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

4/28/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

5/5/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

5/20/2022: NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 4A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketACTION: COPIES OF ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY SENT TO SAO, PD AND PACKET TO ORC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SPD-22-020897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 05/27/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A , JDG: KRUG, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEISNER, JEROME LAWRENCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMMER, ANDREW WEST