This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/05/2022 at 21:00:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GREEN JR, TONY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GREEN JR, TONY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

GREEN JR, TONY

GREEN, TONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALLETT, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

GLOVER, JONATHAN

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

CUMMER, ANDREW WEST

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

3/1/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO #22-17397

3/1/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO #22-17397

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

3/1/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

3/1/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

3/1/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

3/1/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

BOND - PAPER - OSI3-10008994

3/2/2022: BOND - PAPER - OSI3-10008994

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

3/2/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

3/3/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

3/7/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

3/9/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

3/9/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

3/11/2022: CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

APPEARANCE RECORD

3/11/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 03/24/2022)

3/24/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 03/24/2022)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: 3941 BUTLER AVENUE, SARASOTA, FL 34234

3/25/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: 3941 BUTLER AVENUE, SARASOTA, FL 34234

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: 3941 BUTLER AVENUE, SARASOTA, FL 34234

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 04/08/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketACTION: COPIES SENT TO SAO, PD PACKET TO ORC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - OSI3-10008994

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO #22-17397

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMMER, ANDREW WEST