This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/29/2022 at 21:02:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GOOD, ISAIAH ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GOOD, ISAIAH ANTHONY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GOOD, ISAIAH ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIDEN, THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/24/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-51980

6/24/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-51980

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/24/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/24/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/24/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/24/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

6/27/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/27/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 7/22/2022)

7/21/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 7/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 7/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF006919NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-51980

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN