This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/10/2022 at 21:04:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GONZALEZ, RAFAEL

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GONZALEZ, RAFAEL. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GONZALEZ, RAFAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAIVILLIG, KAREN

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

MEISNER, JEROME

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-38169

5/6/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-38169

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

5/6/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/6/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

5/6/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

5/6/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/6/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/9/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

5/9/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/9/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

5/10/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST OR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

5/17/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST OR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

5/17/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

5/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 6/6/22)

6/6/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 6/6/22)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 4A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 6/6/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketACTION: COPIES OF THE ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY SENT TO SAO, PD, PACKET TO ORC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST OR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-38169

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEISNER, JEROME LAWRENCE