This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/25/2022 at 21:01:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GOLDSTEIN, MARC BRIAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GOLDSTEIN, MARC BRIAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

GOLDSTEIN, MARC BRIAN

GOLDSTEIN, MARC BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIDEN, THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS, MARK

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/20/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

WARRANT EXECUTED

6/20/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-32956

6/20/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-32956

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/20/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/20/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/20/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/20/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

6/23/2022: PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

6/23/2022: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

INFORMATION ( PAPER VERSION FILED 07/14/2022 )

7/13/2022: INFORMATION ( PAPER VERSION FILED 07/14/2022 )

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( PAPER VERSION FILED 07/14/2022 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED (F.S. 27.52); Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF006797NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-32956

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 07/29/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK