This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/25/2022 at 21:02:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GILLINS, JAMIE ED

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GILLINS, JAMIE ED. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GILLINS, JAMIE ED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS, MARK

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/21/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

CITATION - AG6VC0E

7/21/2022: CITATION - AG6VC0E

CITATION - AG6VC2E

7/21/2022: CITATION - AG6VC2E

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-61326

7/21/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-61326

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/21/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/21/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/21/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/21/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPAION IN DISCOVERY

7/24/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPAION IN DISCOVERY

CITATION # AG6VC0E

7/27/2022: CITATION # AG6VC0E

CITATION # AG6VC2E

7/27/2022: CITATION # AG6VC2E

BOND - PAPER POWER NO AS6K-846209

8/4/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO AS6K-846209

BOND - PAPER POWER NO AS6K-846208

8/4/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO AS6K-846208

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

8/4/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO AS6K-846208

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO AS6K-846209

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION # AG6VC2E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION # AG6VC0E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPAION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AG6VC2E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AG6VC0E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-61326

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AG6VC2E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AG6VC0E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK