This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/14/2022 at 21:16:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GEDEON, TORRY

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GEDEON, TORRY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GEDEON, TORRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIDEN, THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

GRAVES, CHRISTOPHER

GLOVER, JONATHAN

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GETTY, AARON

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

9/13/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

9/13/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

9/12/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER -SETTING BOND

9/9/2022: ORDER -SETTING BOND

APPEARANCE RECORD

9/9/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/30/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

8/30/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

8/29/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

SUMMONS NON SERVED

8/25/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/11/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

8/11/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO; 1334 YORKSHIRE ST PORT CHARLOTTE FL 33952

8/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED TO; 1334 YORKSHIRE ST PORT CHARLOTTE FL 33952

INFORMATION

8/10/2022: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

8/8/2022: NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

8/8/2022: MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/11/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/11/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/11/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:15 AM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022MM008656NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketACTION: EMAILED ORDER ON BONDS TO BOOKING COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER -SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Sep 9 2022 9:15AM JUDGE: DENKIN, DAVID LEE LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF007012NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-34240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAVES, CHRISTOPHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GETTY, AARON