Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 10:50:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GARGIULO, MARCUS ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GARGIULO, MARCUS ANTHONY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, STEPHEN and WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, STEPHEN

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

GARGIULO, MARCUS ANTHONY

GARGUILO, MARCUS ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DRAPER, ANDREW

STERBINSKY, WILLIAM

FELIX, DAVID

SLOAN, MARLO

WOODS, TANNER

Defendant Attorneys

CUCINOTTA, KRISTINA

SPEYER, ERIN

BAISHANSKI, ALEXANDRA

XINIDIS, MARIA

RUBIN, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

8/19/2019: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

7/5/2019: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

MOTION TO CONTINUE

5/4/2018: MOTION TO CONTINUE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

3/2/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER FOR TRIAL

2/22/2018: ORDER FOR TRIAL

ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

1/3/2018: ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

MEMORANDUM

10/12/2017: MEMORANDUM

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

3/31/2017: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

MOTION FOR COMPETENCY HEARING

3/3/2017: MOTION FOR COMPETENCY HEARING

ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT

11/22/2019: ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

9/6/2019: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 19-49877

6/21/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 19-49877

ORDER FINDING DEFENDANT COMPETENT TO PROCEED

2/14/2019: ORDER FINDING DEFENDANT COMPETENT TO PROCEED

ORDER ON MOTION TO DECLARE DEFENDANT INDIGENT FOR COSTS

6/18/2018: ORDER ON MOTION TO DECLARE DEFENDANT INDIGENT FOR COSTS

APPEARANCE RECORD

2/22/2018: APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER FINDING DEFENDANT COMPETENT TO PROCEED

2/22/2018: ORDER FINDING DEFENDANT COMPETENT TO PROCEED

ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXCEPTION TO 916.107, F.S

4/26/2017: ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXCEPTION TO 916.107, F.S

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

2/10/2017: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT, REVIEW & ACTION TAKEN RE: MENTAL HEALTH RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • HearingTime:11:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM JAIL; Description:CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM JAIL; Description:CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING ;Court Result:CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 4B; Description:CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL CONVERSATION DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT, REVIEW & ACTION TAKEN RE: CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING DATE: Aug 27 2020 11:30AM JUDGE: PADAR, DONNA LOCATION: JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING DATE: Aug 27 2020 10:00AM JUDGE: PADAR, DONNA LOCATION: JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Mar 1 2017 9:00AM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$618.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$618.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 17-11177

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAPER , ANDREW JOB

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERBINSKY, WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLOAN, MARLO