This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 21:08:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS FUEYO, MATTHEW HARRISON

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against FUEYO, MATTHEW HARRISON. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FUEYO, MATTHEW HARRISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

NAWARA, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

7/1/2022: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FROM PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/"CALENDAR CALL"

7/1/2022: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FROM PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/"CALENDAR CALL"

COMPLAINT CITATION 95604

7/1/2022: COMPLAINT CITATION 95604

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

7/18/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2B; Description: CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 08/16/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT CITATION 95604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE FROM PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/"CALENDAR CALL"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 07/18/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAWARA, DANIEL