This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 21:12:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS FREDA, KAYLA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FREDA, KAYLA. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FREDA, KAYLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PASQUALI, JAMIE

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

CUMMER, ANDREW WEST

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

3/17/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

3/17/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

3/17/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

3/17/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

3/17/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

3/17/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

3/18/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

3/18/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

3/21/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

3/30/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

3/30/2022: ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY,WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

4/4/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY,WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

4/6/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY,WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF003181 POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF003181NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMMER, ANDREW WEST

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASQUALI, JAMIE