This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/16/2022 at 21:00:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS FORERO, JUAN ESTEBAN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FORERO, JUAN ESTEBAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FORERO, JUAN ESTEBAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIDEN, THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

SOLER, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

8/12/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/12/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

WARRANT EXECUTED

8/12/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-046034

8/12/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-046034

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/12/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/12/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

8/12/2022: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

WITNESS STATEMENT

8/12/2022: WITNESS STATEMENT

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/12/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/12/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/12/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

8/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

CASH 9076760A POSTED $15,000.00

8/16/2022: CASH 9076760A POSTED $15,000.00

BOND - CASH POWER NO. 9076760A

8/16/2022: BOND - CASH POWER NO. 9076760A

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

9/15/2022: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

PAYMENT $15000.00 RECEIPT #2022083914 FROM CASH BOND #9076760A

9/15/2022: PAYMENT $15000.00 RECEIPT #2022083914 FROM CASH BOND #9076760A

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY; Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $15000.00 RECEIPT #2022083914 FROM CASH BOND #9076760A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - CASH POWER NO. 9076760A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH 9076760A POSTED $15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCASH BOND PAYMENT RECEIPT: 2022072878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-046034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 09/23/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLER, JOSEPH