This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/10/2022 at 21:05:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS FLOWERS, DAVID JR

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FLOWERS, DAVID JR. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FLOWERS, DAVID JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUMERICKHOUSE, KAYLIN

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

ADAMS, MARK

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

5/6/2022: INFORMATION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-22945

5/6/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-22945

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

5/6/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/9/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/9/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

CAPIAS EXECUTED

5/9/2022: CAPIAS EXECUTED

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/9/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

5/9/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

5/9/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

5/10/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 4A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 06/10/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A , JDG: KRUG, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022002364 - CAPIAS (CRIMINAL) - CURRENT STATUS: EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022002364 - CAPIAS (CRIMINAL) - ISSUED: CHARGE ONLY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketORDER - CAPIAS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-22945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK