This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/17/2022 at 21:05:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS FITZGIBBONS JR, ROBERT EDWARD Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FITZGIBBONS JR, ROBERT EDWARD. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

FITZGIBBONS JR, ROBERT EDWARD

FITZGIBBONS, ROBERT E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/13/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/13/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SPD #2022-00025678

5/13/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SPD #2022-00025678

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

5/13/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

5/13/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

5/16/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

5/16/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/16/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

APPEARANCE RECORD

6/17/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF005534NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SPD #2022-00025678

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN