This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 21:02:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS FERGUSON, SEAN GALEN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FERGUSON, SEAN GALEN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FERGUSON, SEAN GALEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JONES, BRANDON

 

Court Documents

CITATION - AFHSKTE

1/21/2022: CITATION - AFHSKTE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS; DESIGNATON OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

2/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS; DESIGNATON OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS; DESIGNATON OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AFHSKTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AFHSKTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 03/01/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant