This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 07/25/2022 at 21:05:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DUDA, ETHAN MARC

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DUDA, ETHAN MARC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DUDA, ETHAN MARC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, AMANDA

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS, MARK

CHITTARO, LISA

WAGONER, MAGDALENA

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-42432

5/19/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-42432

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

5/19/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/19/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/19/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/8/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/13/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

6/20/2022: NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

INFORMATION

6/20/2022: INFORMATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

6/27/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/7/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DISCOVERY - NOTICE

7/7/2022: DISCOVERY - NOTICE

WAIVER - OF FORMAL ARRAIGNMENT, ENTRY OF NOT GUILTY PLEA , DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/7/2022: WAIVER - OF FORMAL ARRAIGNMENT, ENTRY OF NOT GUILTY PLEA , DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

7/11/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/13/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 08/01/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER - OF FORMAL ARRAIGNMENT, ENTRY OF NOT GUILTY PLEA , DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY - NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 07/11/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-42432

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAGONER, MAGDALENA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHITTARO, LISA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK