This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/07/2022 at 21:03:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DOELLING, MARY KATHERINE

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DOELLING, MARY KATHERINE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DOELLING, MARY KATHERINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, AMANDA

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/4/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD #22-44911

8/4/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD #22-44911

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/4/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/4/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/4/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/4/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS6K846236

8/5/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS6K846236

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

8/8/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

8/8/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED ON 8/19/22)

8/19/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED ON 8/19/22)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED ON 8/19/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS6K846236

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD #22-44911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN