This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/25/2022 at 21:00:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DISEKER JR, DONALD CRAIG

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DISEKER JR, DONALD CRAIG. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DISEKER JR, DONALD CRAIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASTOR, AMANDA

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

CUMMER, ANDREW WEST

SANDAIRE, DIXON

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

2/11/2022: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, REQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGE, AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

2/11/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, REQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGE, AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

BOND - PAPER - POWER # OSI610007182

2/11/2022: BOND - PAPER - POWER # OSI610007182

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

2/4/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

2/2/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

2/2/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 02/01/2022)

1/31/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 02/01/2022)

STATES DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

1/31/2022: STATES DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

1/28/2022: ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

MOTION - TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

1/28/2022: MOTION - TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/26/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

1/24/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

1/21/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

1/21/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-5415

1/21/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-5415

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/21/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

1/21/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

1/21/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 4B; Description:CRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/20/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 4B , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, REQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGE, AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER # OSI610007182

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketACTION: COPIES OF ORDER APPOINTING JAC REGISTRY TO SAO, ORC, JAC, DEFENDANT AND PACKET SENT TO MARIA CASTAGLIUOLO, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-5415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDAIRE, DIXON LAURENT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMMER, ANDREW WEST