This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/14/2022 at 21:04:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DIEDERICH, FINN PHILLIPPE

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DIEDERICH, FINN PHILLIPPE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DIEDERICH, FINN PHILLIPPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

ADAMS, MARK

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/10/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-25231

5/10/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-25231

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/10/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

5/10/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

5/10/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY RIAL,AND NOTIE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

5/12/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY RIAL,AND NOTIE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. A53K - 509613

5/12/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. A53K - 509613

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. A51K - 574044

5/12/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. A51K - 574044

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

5/12/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. A51K - 574044

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. A53K - 509613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY RIAL,AND NOTIE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF005434NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF005434NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-25231

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK