This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 21:03:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DE LA CRUZ, ALEXIS CABRERA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DE LA CRUZ, ALEXIS CABRERA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DE LA CRUZ, ALEXIS CABRERA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

1/21/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

CITATION - AFHSLSE

1/21/2022: CITATION - AFHSLSE

1ST CLARIFICATION LETTER SENT TO LAW ENFORCEMENT

1/21/2022: 1ST CLARIFICATION LETTER SENT TO LAW ENFORCEMENT

CLARIFICATION LETTER RETURNED FROM LAW ENFORCEMENT

1/24/2022: CLARIFICATION LETTER RETURNED FROM LAW ENFORCEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLARIFICATION LETTER RETURNED FROM LAW ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AFHSLSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST CLARIFICATION LETTER SENT TO LAW ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AFHSLSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 03/02/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant