This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2022 at 21:03:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CURTIS, GALEN ANDRE

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CURTIS, GALEN ANDRE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CURTIS, GALEN ANDRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

CUMMER, ANDREW WEST

ADAMS, MARK

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

1/14/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

1/14/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/14/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

1/14/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

1/14/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

1/14/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

1/18/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/18/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

2/1/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

2/4/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

2/7/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketACTION: COPIES OF ORDER APPOINTING JAC REGISTRY TO SAO, PD AND PACKET SENT TO ORC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMMER, ANDREW WEST