This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/16/2022 at 21:01:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CUARTASCASTELLANOS, JUAN CAMILO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CUARTASCASTELLANOS, JUAN CAMILO. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PADAR, DONNA and CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CUARTASCASTELLANOS, JUAN CAMILO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREINER, WILLIAM

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

BAEZ, JOHN

CASTAGLIUOLO, MARIA

 

Court Documents

MOTION - TO INCUR COSTS FOR INTERPRETER

9/14/2022: MOTION - TO INCUR COSTS FOR INTERPRETER

MOTION - TO INCUR COSTS FOR PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR

9/10/2022: MOTION - TO INCUR COSTS FOR PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR

INFORMATION - AMENDED

9/2/2022: INFORMATION - AMENDED

INFORMATION - AMENDED

9/2/2022: INFORMATION - AMENDED

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/30/22)

8/29/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/30/22)

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - ORANGE COUNTY

8/26/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - ORANGE COUNTY

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - ORANGE COUNTY

8/26/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - ORANGE COUNTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

8/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING REGIONAL COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND ORDER APPOINTING JAC REGISTRY ATTORNEY

8/25/2022: ORDER GRANTING REGIONAL COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND ORDER APPOINTING JAC REGISTRY ATTORNEY

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

8/19/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

8/16/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/12/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/12/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/12/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/12/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-41884

8/12/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-41884

WARRANT EXECUTED

8/12/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/12/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO INCUR COSTS FOR INTERPRETER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO INCUR COSTS FOR PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION - AMENDED (PAPER VERSION FILED 9/6/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/30/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REGIONAL COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND ORDER APPOINTING JAC REGISTRY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-41884

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTAGLIUOLO, MARIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAEZ, JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON