This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/20/2022 at 21:04:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CRAWFORD III, CECIL W Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CRAWFORD III, CECIL W. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

CRAWFORD III, CECIL W

CRAWFORD, CECIL WESLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CUMMER, ANDREW WEST

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT OTHER- 22-19743

3/16/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT OTHER- 22-19743

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

4/4/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/4/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/4/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/4/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/4/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

WARRANT EXECUTED

4/4/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/5/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/6/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ADVISORY HEARING BOND - MANATEE CO.

4/7/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND - MANATEE CO.

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

4/8/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

4/8/2022: ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

4/11/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 4A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND DEFENDANTS PRESENCE, AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketACTION: ORDER (DIN 16) SENT TO SAO, PD AND PACKET TO ORC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND - MANATEE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 05/13/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A , JDG: KRUG, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022001362 - ARREST WARRANT (CRIMINAL) - CURRENT STATUS: EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022001362 - ARREST WARRANT (CRIMINAL) - ISSUED: CHARGE ONLY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT OTHER- 22-19743

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMMER, ANDREW WEST