This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/20/2022 at 11:32:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS COSTACHE, SILVIU

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COSTACHE, SILVIU. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COSTACHE, SILVIU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, JORDAN

Defendant Attorneys

BAEZ, JOHN

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/12/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-68080

8/12/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-68080

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/12/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/12/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/12/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/12/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

BOND - PAPER POWER NO 2022-BB-020851

8/15/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO 2022-BB-020851

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

8/16/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

8/16/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - AMENDED

8/18/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - AMENDED

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION - AMENDED

8/18/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION - AMENDED

PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

8/19/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

8/22/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMET, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMET, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

9/1/2022: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY; Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMET, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO 2022-BB-020851

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-68080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAEZ, JOHN