This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 07/13/2022 at 21:03:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS COSMAN, KURT WALTER

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COSMAN, KURT WALTER. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COSMAN, KURT WALTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHIPPLE, LIANA

Defendant Attorneys

GLOVER, JONATHAN

FORD, PATRICK JAMES

 

Court Documents

BOND - PAPER : POWER NUMBER 562696411 - 3

4/25/2022: BOND - PAPER : POWER NUMBER 562696411 - 3

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO # 22-34350

4/25/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO # 22-34350

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

4/25/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/25/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/25/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION; PLEA OF NOTGUILTY; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

5/2/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION; PLEA OF NOTGUILTY; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

6/3/2022: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: 6105 WACHULA RD, MYAKKA CITY, FL 34251

6/9/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: 6105 WACHULA RD, MYAKKA CITY, FL 34251

INFORMATION

6/8/2022: INFORMATION

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

6/23/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

SUMMONS NON SERVED

6/27/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 07/19/2022 AT 10:30 AM IN 2A , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: 6105 WACHULA RD, MYAKKA CITY, FL 34251

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 06/23/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION; PLEA OF NOTGUILTY; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO # 22-34350

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER : POWER NUMBER 562696411 - 3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORD, PATRICK JAMES