This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/15/2022 at 21:04:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CLAYTON, FREDERICK HENRY

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CLAYTON, FREDERICK HENRY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CLAYTON JR, FREDERICK H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/12/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

8/12/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/12/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

WITNESS STATEMENT

8/12/2022: WITNESS STATEMENT

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/12/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/12/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/12/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

8/17/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

AFFIDAVIT FOR INDIGENCY DENIED

8/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT FOR INDIGENCY DENIED

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

8/25/2022: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/25/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE CANCELLING HEARING

8/29/2022: NOTICE CANCELLING HEARING

BOND - PAPER POWER NO 2022-BB-020957

8/30/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO 2022-BB-020957

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Description: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING; Court Result: CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO 2022-BB-020957

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CANCELLING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Sep 28 2022 9:00AM JUDGE: PADAR, DONNA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Sep 28 2022 9:00AM JUDGE: PADAR, DONNA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR INDIGENCY DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE DENIED (F.S 27.52); Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN