Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 04/16/2021 at 17:02:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CHESSE, NICHOLAS MARTIN

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CHESSE, NICHOLAS MARTIN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CHESSE, NICHOLAS MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

4/5/2021: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2021-27300

4/2/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2021-27300

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

4/2/2021: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/2/2021: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/2/2021: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/2/2021: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/2/2021: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 4A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2021CF003689NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2021-27300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 05/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A , JDG: KRUG, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant