Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 05/07/2021 at 21:00:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CHAVEZ GONZALEZ, MARIA

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CHAVEZ GONZALEZ, MARIA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CHAVEZ GONZALEZ, MARIA

 

Court Documents

CITATION AE405IE

4/2/2021: CITATION AE405IE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AE405IE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION AE405IE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 05/17/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant