This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2022 at 21:03:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CARD, DANIEL RICHARD

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CARD, DANIEL RICHARD. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CARD, DANIEL RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/14/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2022-2197

1/14/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2022-2197

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

1/14/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

1/14/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

1/14/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

1/18/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

1/18/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

BOND - PAPER - POWER #AS6K-817950

1/18/2022: BOND - PAPER - POWER #AS6K-817950

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

1/19/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

2/1/2022: ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE 2022CF000495NC (893.13(1A2)) REVOKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022000536 - SPR REVOKED - CURRENT STATUS: ACCEPTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022000536 - SPR REVOKED - ISSUED: VIOLATION OF TERMS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER #AS6K-817950

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF000495NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2022-2197

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN