This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:02:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BYNUM, KHALIL ALI

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BYNUM, KHALIL ALI. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BYNUM, KHALIL ALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOODS, TANNER

Defendant Attorney

DAVY, AMANDA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

10/14/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

10/13/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 10/14/20)

10/13/2020: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 10/14/20)

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

10/6/2020: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/6/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

10/1/2020: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

10/1/2020: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

9/25/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

9/25/2020: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

REPORT SUMMARY INCIDENT REPORT

9/25/2020: REPORT SUMMARY INCIDENT REPORT

REPORT BOOKING REPORT CHARLOTTE COUNTY

9/25/2020: REPORT BOOKING REPORT CHARLOTTE COUNTY

ADVISORY HEARING BOND - CHARLOTTE CO.

9/25/2020: ADVISORY HEARING BOND - CHARLOTTE CO.

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

9/25/2020: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #20-68192

9/25/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #20-68192

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9/25/2020: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM JAIL; Description:CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING ;Court Result:CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Oct 15 2020 2:00PM JUDGE: PADAR, DONNA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 10/14/20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Oct 15 2020 2:00PM JUDGE: PADAR, DONNA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$50.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT SUMMARY INCIDENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT BOOKING REPORT CHARLOTTE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND - CHARLOTTE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #20-68192

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 11/06/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less