This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/01/2022 at 21:02:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BUTLER, BRETT JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BUTLER, BRETT JOSEPH. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BUTLER, BRETT JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

ADAMS, MARK

 

Court Documents

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. PSE50986078

6/27/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. PSE50986078

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/27/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-34169

6/27/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-34169

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION 22-34169

6/27/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION 22-34169

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/27/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/27/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/27/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/28/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION 22-34169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-34169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. PSE50986078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 08/12/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A , JDG: KRUG, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK