Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 07/16/2021 at 21:01:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BROLICK, GERALD W

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BROLICK, GERALD W. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BROLICK, GERALD W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCINTOSH, BRETT DONALD

 

Court Documents

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

7/1/2021: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

6/16/2021: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

6/16/2021: ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

6/15/2021: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

6/15/2021: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

6/15/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

6/15/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

BOND - PAPER POWER #AS30K161573

6/14/2021: BOND - PAPER POWER #AS30K161573

BOND - PAPER POWER #AS30K161574

6/14/2021: BOND - PAPER POWER #AS30K161574

COPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

6/11/2021: COPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/11/2021: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/11/2021: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

AFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

6/11/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

AFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

6/11/2021: AFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #21-49290

6/11/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #21-49290

CITATION - AEVFGEE

6/11/2021: CITATION - AEVFGEE

CITATION - AEGVB0E

6/11/2021: CITATION - AEGVB0E

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/11/2021: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 08/10/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN J , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REFUSAL TO BREATH, URINE OR BLOOD TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #21-49290

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AEVFGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AEGVB0E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTOSH, BRETT DONALD