Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 10:10:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS , BOSTON Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against , BOSTON. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

, BOSTON

MIKE, BOSTON

MARI, MICHAEL JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIPPERT, RICHARD

KERNAN, BROOKE

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

LOMBARDI, GINO

MORRIS, JEFFREY

LOMBARDO, PETER JAMES

BAISHANSKI, ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

10/20/2017: ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

10/20/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

9/15/2017: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

9/15/2017: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

VOP WARRANT EXECUTED

9/15/2017: VOP WARRANT EXECUTED

APPEARANCE RECORD

9/15/2017: APPEARANCE RECORD

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

9/7/2017: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

8/31/2017: VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

8/25/2017: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

ENTRY OF PLEA OF DENIAL TO PETITION FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION OR COMMUNITY CONTROL AND DEMAND FOR FORMAL HEARING AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

8/25/2017: ENTRY OF PLEA OF DENIAL TO PETITION FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION OR COMMUNITY CONTROL AND DEMAND FOR FORMAL HEARING AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

BOND - PAPER POWER #2017AA012406

8/25/2017: BOND - PAPER POWER #2017AA012406

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/24/2017: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

7/18/2017: ORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

SCORESHEET

7/17/2017: SCORESHEET

APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITH A BOND

7/17/2017: APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITH A BOND

APPEARANCE RECORD

4/4/2017: APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION INFOR

2/22/2017: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION INFOR

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

2/8/2017: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCASE RECALLED FROM LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020118519)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDRIVER'S LICENSE REINSTATEMENT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $964.49 RECEIPT #2020067476

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCASE SENT TO COLLECTIONS AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCASE SENT TO COLLECTIONS AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - COST - PAY PLAN - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019065367)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - COST - PAY PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAY PLAN NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION INFOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER # 006-10393467

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$964.49; Amount Paid:$964.49; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT #17-10119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where (Boston office of the) Social Security Administration is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KERNAN, BROOKE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD LIPPERT