Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 05/07/2021 at 21:00:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BOROVICH, SHANNA RENEA

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BOROVICH, SHANNA RENEA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BOROVICH, SHANNA RENEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINDSON, KEVIN

Defendant Attorneys

SLOAN, CATHERINE E

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

4/19/2021: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

4/16/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

INFORMATION PAPER VERSION FILED 04/16/2021

4/16/2021: INFORMATION PAPER VERSION FILED 04/16/2021

ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

4/7/2021: ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/5/2021: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

4/5/2021: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2021-27300

4/2/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2021-27300

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

4/2/2021: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/2/2021: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/2/2021: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/2/2021: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/2/2021: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 05/18/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN J , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION PAPER VERSION FILED 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSPR RELEASE 2021MM003690SC (812.014(2E)*) REVOKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketWARRANT # 212021001661 - SPR REVOKED - ISSUED: VIOLATION OF TERMS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketWARRANT # 212021001661 - SPR REVOKED - CURRENT STATUS: ACCEPTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2021MM003690SC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2021-27300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 04/19/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN J , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINDSON, KEVIN