This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/11/2022 at 18:02:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BOKENO, RYAN PHILLIP

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BOKENO, RYAN PHILLIP. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BOKENO, RYAN PHILLIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLINGHAM, MATT

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

ADAMS, MARK

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/18/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/18/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/18/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/18/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO #22-60400

7/18/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO #22-60400

WITNESS STATEMENT

7/18/2022: WITNESS STATEMENT

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/18/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/19/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/2/22)

8/1/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/2/22)

AMENDED PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-60400

8/8/2022: AMENDED PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-60400

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/8/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-60400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/2/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO #22-60400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK