This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/27/2020 at 18:01:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BLAIR, NICHOLAS SIMON

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BLAIR, NICHOLAS SIMON. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BLAIR, NICHOLAS SIMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

RUBIN, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

2/19/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

BOND - PAPER # AA19611274

2/18/2020: BOND - PAPER # AA19611274

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/12/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

2/12/2020: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

2/11/2020: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

2/7/2020: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

2/5/2020: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

CITATION ACQLIQE

2/5/2020: CITATION ACQLIQE

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

2/3/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

2/3/2020: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

CITATION ACQLIQE

2/3/2020: CITATION ACQLIQE

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 20-8636

2/3/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 20-8636

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

2/3/2020: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

WITNESS STATEMENT

2/3/2020: WITNESS STATEMENT

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

2/3/2020: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE DENIED

2/3/2020: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE DENIED

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

2/3/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM JAIL; Description:CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER # AA19611274

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Mar 11 2020 9:00AM JUDGE: PADAR, DONNA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION ACQLIQE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 20-8636

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less